Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frank Yohana Kalabat

Bishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean), USA

Apostolic Administrator of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1970 Born
5 Jul 199525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean), USA
3 May 201443.9AppointedBishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean), USA
14 Jun 201444.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean), USA
9 Aug 201747.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mar Addai of Toronto (Chaldean), Canada

MicroData Summary for Frank Yohana Kalabat
Bishop Frank Yohana Kalabat (born ) Bishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKuwait, Kuwait
Ordained BishopMother of God, Cathedral, Southfield

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Detroit (Chaldean).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 May 2014
  • ob: CB, 5 May 2014
  • c23: CB, 7 Jun 2014
  • c4: CB, 14 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,184
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Aug 2017