Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David John Walkowiak

Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1953 Born
9 Jun 197925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
18 Apr 201359.8AppointedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
18 Jun 201360.0Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for David John Walkowiak
Bishop David John Walkowiak (born ) Bishop of Grand Rapids

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCleveland, OH

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grand Rapids.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2013
  • ob: CB, 18 Apr 2013
  • c2+: CB, 25 May 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,804

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018