Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Joseph Fisher

Auxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA

Titular Bishop of Forum Popilii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1959 Born
27 Jun 199232.7Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
23 Nov 201657.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
23 Nov 201657.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii
25 Jan 201757.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Popilii

MicroData Summary for Robert Joseph Fisher
Bishop Robert Joseph Fisher (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Detroit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan
Ordained BishopMost Blessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Detroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Detroit.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2016
  • mn/ob: Website of the Diocese, 23 Nov 2016
  • c34: CB, 9 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Jan 2017