Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Asagoro Wakida (Wakita)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yokohama, Japan

Titular Bishop of Iamnia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1881Born
4 Jul 190927.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 194765.4AppointedBishop of Yokohama, Japan
27 May 194765.5Ordained BishopBishop of Yokohama, Japan
5 Jul 195169.6ResignedBishop of Yokohama, Japan
5 Jul 195169.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Iamnia
16 Mar 196583.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Yokohama, Japan

MicroData Summary for Thomas Asagoro Wakida (Wakita)
Bishop Thomas Asagoro Wakida (Wakita) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yokohama

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagasaki
Ordained BishopTōkyō, Archdiocese of Tōkyō

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 47
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 4,022
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast