Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre Berlioz, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hakodate, Japan

Titular Bishop of Ostracine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1852Born
10 Sep 187219.9ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
10 Oct 187523.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
24 Apr 189138.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hakodate, Japan
24 Apr 189138.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Calynda
15 Jun 189138.7AppointedBishop of Hakodate, Japan
25 Jul 189138.8Ordained BishopBishop of Hakodate, Japan
25 Jul 192774.8RetiredBishop of Hakodate, Japan
25 Jul 192774.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ostracine
30 Dec 192977.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Hakodate, Japan

MicroData Summary for Alexandre Berlioz
Bishop Alexandre Berlioz M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hakodate

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerrières-en-Chantagne, Archdiocese of Chambéry, France
Ordained BishopSt. Paul d'Asakusa, Tokyo

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 174, and Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018