Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Bonne, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Tōkyō


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1855BornSaint-Christophe, France
20 Sep 187924.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
15 Sep 191055.5AppointedArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
1 May 191156.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
11 Jan 191256.8DiedArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan

MicroData Summary for François Bonne:
Archbishop François Bonne M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Tōkyō

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013