Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Caprais Vasselon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osaka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1854BornCraponne-sur-Arzon, France
22 Apr 187723.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
18 Aug 189339.4AppointedBishop of Osaka, Japan
30 Nov 189339.7Ordained BishopBishop of Osaka, Japan
7 Mar 189641.9DiedBishop of Osaka, Japan

MicroData Summary for Henri-Caprais Vasselon:
Bishop Henri-Caprais Vasselon M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Osaka

  • a priest for 18.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 429

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013