Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Auguste Chatron, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Osaka, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1844Born
26 Sep 186925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Belley, France
187227.6ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
22 Jul 189652.2AppointedBishop of Osaka, Japan
18 Oct 189652.4Ordained BishopBishop of Osaka, Japan
7 May 191773.0DiedBishop of Osaka, Japan

MicroData Summary for Jules-Auguste Chatron
Bishop Jules-Auguste Chatron M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Osaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharix, France

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 429

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017