Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Claude Combaz, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nagasaki, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1856Born
26 Sep 188023.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Jun 191255.4AppointedBishop of Nagasaki, Japan
8 Sep 191255.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nagasaki, Japan
18 Aug 192669.6DiedBishop of Nagasaki, Japan

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Combaz
Bishop Jean-Claude Combaz M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nagasaki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Béron, France

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018