Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gustave-Charles-Marie Mutel, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Seoul

Titular Archbishop of Ratiaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1854BornBlumeray, France
24 Feb 187723.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
2 Sep 189036.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Corea
2 Sep 189036.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Milo
21 Sep 189036.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milo
8 Apr 191157.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Seoul, Korea (South)
31 Jan 192368.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Mopsuestia
11 Jan 192671.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ratiaria
22 Jan 193378.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Seoul, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Gustave-Charles-Marie Mutel:
Archbishop Gustave-Charles-Marie Mutel M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Seoul

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013