Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martial-Pierre-Marie Jannin, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kontum

Titular Bishop of Gadara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1867BornBesançon, France
28 Sep 189023.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
10 Jan 193366.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kontum, Viet Nam
10 Jan 193366.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadara
23 Jun 193366.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadara
16 Jul 194073.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Kontum, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Martial-Pierre-Marie Jannin:
Bishop Martial-Pierre-Marie Jannin M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kontum

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013