Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Boniface (Josef) Sauer, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Tokugen o Tokwon, Korea (North)

Titular Bishop of Appiaria

Apostolic Administrator of Hamheung


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1877Born
4 Feb 190023.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Jul 190326.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Aug 192043.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Wonsan, Korea (North)
25 Aug 192043.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Appiaria
1 May 192144.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Appiaria
9 Jul 192851.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ilan, China
15 Feb 193457.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Ilan, China
12 Jan 194063.0AppointedAbbot of Tokugen o Tokwon, Korea (North)
12 Jan 194063.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Hamheung, Korea (North)
7 Feb 195073.0DiedAbbot of Tokugen o Tokwon, Korea (North)

MicroData Summary for Boniface (Josef) Sauer (VIAF: 2764148451576315970004)
Bishop Boniface (Josef) Sauer O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Tokugen o Tokwon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOberuffhausen, Diocese of Fulda, Germany
Ordained BishopSeoul
Death PlacePrison, Pyongyang

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1921, Number 26
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 61
  • ab: CB, 27 Oct 2017
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Jan 2020
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Sep 2021

Quantcast