Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prefecture Apostolic of Jiamusi [Kiamusze]

Apostolica Praefectura Khiamuszeensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Prefecture Apostolic
  • Elevated: 9 April 1940
  • Prefecture
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Jiamusi, Heilongjiang, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Ilan
9 July 1928ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Ilan (erected)
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Kiamusze [Jiamusi]
13 April 1937Name ChangedMission "Sui Iuris" of Ilan Mission "Sui Iuris" of Kiamusze [Jiamusi]
Prefecture Apostolic of Jiamusi [Kiamusze]
9 April 1940ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Kiamusze [Jiamusi] Prefecture Apostolic of Jiamusi [Kiamusze]

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011