Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Adalard Eberharter, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Kiamusze [Jiamusi], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1887Born
190416.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Jun 191023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Mar 193446.7AppointedSuperior of Ilan, China
9 Apr 194052.8ResignedSuperior of Kiamusze [Jiamusi], China
31 Mar 197486.7DiedSuperior Emeritus of Kiamusze [Jiamusi], China

MicroData Summary for Adalard Eberharter
Father Adalard Eberharter O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Kiamusze [Jiamusi]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZell, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria
Death PlaceZams, Tirol, Austria

  • a priest for 63.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast