Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Émile-Alexandre-Joseph Devred, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Seoul

Titular Bishop of Hesbon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1877BornRaucourt-au-Bois, France
23 Sep 189922.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
20 Aug 192043.6SelectedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Seoul, Korea (South)
20 Dec 192044.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Seoul, Korea (South)
20 Dec 192044.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Hesbon
1 May 192144.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hesbon
18 Jan 192649.0DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Seoul, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Émile-Alexandre-Joseph Devred:
Bishop Émile-Alexandre-Joseph Devred M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Seoul

  • a priest for 26.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013