Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Marie-Michel Blois, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1881Born
18 Sep 190423.0ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
28 May 190523.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
29 Jun 190523.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
19 Dec 192140.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}, China
29 Dec 192140.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
28 May 192240.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
11 Apr 194664.5AppointedArchbishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China
18 May 194664.6DiedArchbishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien], China

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie-Michel Blois
Archbishop Jean-Marie-Michel Blois M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMachecoul, Diocese of Nantes, France
Ordained BishopMoukden, Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}
Death PlaceMoukden, Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,922, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast