Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix-Jules-Xavier Jourdan de la Passardière, C.O. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rouen, France

Titular Bishop of Rhosus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1841Born
10 Jun 186524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
3 Oct 188443.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhosus
12 Oct 188443.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhosus
13 Nov 188544.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon (-Vienne), France
1887¹45.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Carthage, Tunisia
Feb 1892³50.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rouen, France
1908¹66.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Rouen, France
12 Mar 191371.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rouen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Félix-Jules-Xavier Jourdan de la Passardière (VIAF: 18549987)
Bishop Félix-Jules-Xavier Jourdan de la Passardière C.O. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rouen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranville
Ordained BishopLa Grande Chartreuse, Isere

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 482
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017