Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-Paul-Marie Chabanon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Huê

Titular Bishop of Bitylius


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1873BornAntrenas, France
28 Jun 189623.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Jul 193057.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Huê, Viet Nam
3 Jul 193057.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bitylius
28 Oct 193057.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bitylius
20 Jun 193158.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Huê, Viet Nam
4 Jun 193662.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Huê, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Paul-Marie Chabanon:
Bishop Alexandre-Paul-Marie Chabanon M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Huê

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013