Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Christian-Marie de Cooman, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Thanh Hóa

Titular Bishop of Tacia Montana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1881BornNinove, Belgium
26 Jun 190422.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
12 Jun 191735.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Coastal Tonking {Tonkino Marittimo}, Viet Nam
12 Jun 191735.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
6 Jan 191836.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
21 Jun 193250.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Thanh Hóa, Viet Nam
31 Jan 193351.1InstalledVicar Apostolic of Thanh Hóa, Viet Nam
24 Nov 196078.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Thanh Hóa, Viet Nam
7 Jun 197088.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Thanh Hóa, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Louis-Christian-Marie de Cooman:
Bishop Louis-Christian-Marie de Cooman M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Thanh Hóa

  • a priest for 65.9 years
  • a bishop for 52.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013