Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre-Alexandre Marcou, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Phát Diêm

Titular Bishop of Lysias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1857BornLunel, France
20 Sep 187922.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Dec 187922.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
18 Apr 189537.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
18 Apr 189537.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lysias
15 Oct 189538.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lysias
15 Apr 190143.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Coastal Tonking {Tonkino Marittimo}, Viet Nam
8 Feb 190244.7InstalledVicar Apostolic of Coastal Tonking {Tonkino Marittimo}, Viet Nam
20 Oct 193578.4RetiredVicar Apostolic of Phát Diêm, Viet Nam
7 Dec 193982.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Phát Diêm, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre-Alexandre Marcou:
Bishop Jean-Pierre-Alexandre Marcou M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Phát Diêm

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013