Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie Lavest, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China

Titular Bishop of Sophene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1852Born
30 Nov 187523.5Ordained PriestPriest
1879¹26.6ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
26 Apr 190047.9AppointedPrefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China
26 Apr 190047.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sophene
24 Aug 190048.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sophene
22 Aug 191058.2DiedPrefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Lavest
Bishop Joseph-Marie Lavest M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCourpière, Diocese of Clermont, France
Ordained BishopHanoi
Death PlaceHongkong

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 524
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 17 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast