Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Phát Diêm

Dioecesis de Phat Diem



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Nguyen Nang, Bishop
  • Joseph Nguyên Van Yên, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 24 November 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hà Nôi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Viêt Nam
  • Square Kilometers: 1,787 (690 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Toa Giam Muc, Phat Diem, Kim Son, Ninh Binh, Viet Nam
  • Telephone: (030)86.20.58
  • Fax: 86.27.24

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Coastal Tonking {Tonkino Marittimo}
15 April 1901ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Coastal Tonking {Tonkino Marittimo} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Phát Diêm
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Coastal Tonking {Tonkino Marittimo} Vicariate Apostolic of Phát Diêm
Diocese of Phát Diêm
24 November 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Phát Diêm Diocese of Phát Diêm

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Phát Diêm
195099,904250,00040.0%1549163612620657ap1951
Diocese of Phát Diêm
196358,900400,00014.7%242262,26573961ap1971
197995,000500,00019.0%13137,30712962ap1991
1999137,760905,90015.2%27275,1026965ap2000
2000137,761905,90015.2%27275,1026965ap2001
2001142,056905,98515.7%26265,463207065ap2002
2002142,056905,98515.7%26265,463207065ap2003
2003146,335915,90016.0%331344,303227065ap2004
2004144,721907,52015.9%301314,668259365ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 13 Apr 2013