Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Nguyễn Thiện Khuyến

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1900Born
5 Apr 193030.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 197676.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam
24 Apr 197777.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam
15 Dec 198181.9DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nguyễn Thiện Khuyến
Bishop Joseph Nguyễn Thiện Khuyến (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Pht Diệm

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhat Diem

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 4 Apr 2020

Quantcast