Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Marie Cardinal Trịnh Như Khu

Deceased

Archbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam

Cardinal-Priest of San Francesco di Paola ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1898Born
1 Apr 193334.3Ordained PriestPriest of H Ni, Viet Nam
18 Apr 195051.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of H Ni, Viet Nam
18 Apr 195051.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Synaus
15 Aug 195051.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Synaus
24 Nov 196061.9AppointedArchbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam
24 May 197677.4Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197677.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Francesco di Paola ai Monti
27 Nov 197879.9DiedArchbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Marie Trịnh Như Khu (VIAF: 256125961)
Joseph Marie Cardinal Trịnh Như Khu (born , died ) Archbishop of H Nội

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrang-Du, Vicariate Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}
Ordained BishopCathedral, H Nội, Vicariate Apostolic of H Ni
Death PlaceH Nội, Archdiocese of H Nội
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph's, Cathedral, H Nội, Archdiocese of H Nội

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
  • a cardinal for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1950, Number 58
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1976

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast