Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Marie Nguyễn Văn Năng

Deceased

Bishop of Vinh, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1910Born
23 Dec 194131.9Ordained PriestPriest of Vinh, Viet Nam
5 Jan 197161.0AppointedBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
12 Mar 197161.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
6 Jul 197868.5DiedBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Marie Nguyễn Văn Năng
Bishop Pierre Marie Nguyễn Văn Năng (born 1910, died ) Bishop of Vinh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKe-Gai

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 800

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 4 Apr 2020

Quantcast