Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Khuất Văn Tạo

Deceased

Bishop of Hải Phòng, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1900Born
10 Jun 193333.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 195555.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Hai Phòng, Viet Nam
7 May 195555.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Carallia
7 Feb 195656.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carallia
24 Nov 196060.8AppointedBishop of Hải Phòng, Viet Nam
19 Aug 197777.6DiedBishop of Hải Phòng, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Khuất Văn Tạo
Bishop Pierre Khuất Văn Tạo (born 1900, died ) Bishop of Hải Phòng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXuân Van

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 2 Apr 2020

Quantcast