Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Chaize, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hà Nôi

Titular Bishop of Alabanda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1882BornMornant, France
29 Jun 190523.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
12 May 192543.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Hà Nôi, Viet Nam
12 May 192543.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Alabanda
22 Nov 192543.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alabanda
7 Feb 193552.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Hà Nôi, Viet Nam
23 Feb 194966.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Hà Nôi, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for François Chaize:
Bishop François Chaize M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hà Nôi

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013