Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Marie L-Huu-Cung

Deceased

Bishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1898Born
14 Jun 193032.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Apr 197577.1AppointedBishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
29 Jun 197577.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
12 Mar 198789.0DiedBishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Dominique Marie L-Huu-Cung
Bishop Dominique Marie L-Huu-Cung (born , died ) Bishop of Bi Chu

EventPlace
Birth PlacePh Nhai

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018