Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Nguyễn Văn Lăng

Deceased

Bishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1921Born
21 May 195129.5Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jul 197452.6AppointedBishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
11 Aug 197452.7Ordained BishopBishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
22 Feb 198866.2DiedBishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Dominique Nguyễn Văn Lăng
Bishop Dominique Nguyễn Văn Lăng (born , died ) Bishop of Xuân Lộc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXuan Hoa
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saigon, Archdiocese of Saigon

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,432
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 4 Apr 2020

Quantcast