Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Marie Nguyễn Minh Nhật

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1926Born
7 Jun 195225.7Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 197548.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
16 Jul 197548.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vergi
16 Jul 197548.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vergi
22 Feb 198861.4SucceededBishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
30 Sep 200478.0RetiredBishop of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
17 Jan 200780.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Marie Nguyễn Minh Nhật
Bishop Paul Marie Nguyễn Minh Nhật (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Xuân Lộc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThuong Kiêm
Ordained BishopXuân Lộc, Diocese of Xuân Lộc

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,801

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 3 Jun 2020

Quantcast