Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Nguyên Văn Trâm

Bishop of Ba Ria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1942 BornPhuoc Tuy
1 May 196927.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 199250.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Xuân Lôc, Viet Nam
6 Mar 199250.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hilta
7 May 199250.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hilta
22 Nov 200563.9AppointedBishop of Ba Ria, Viet Nam
5 Dec 200563.9InstalledBishop of Ba Ria, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Thomas Nguyên Văn Trâm:
Bishop Thomas Nguyên Văn Trâm (born ) Bishop of Ba Ria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ba Ria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,918

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013