Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Nguyễn Văn Ho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nha Trang, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1931Born
20 Dec 195928.4Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 197543.5AppointedBishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
5 Apr 197543.7Ordained BishopBishop of Phan Thiết, Viet Nam
25 Apr 197543.7AppointedBishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam
4 Dec 200978.3RetiredBishop of Nha Trang, Viet Nam
14 Feb 201785.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nha Trang, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Nguyễn Văn Ho
Bishop Paul Nguyễn Văn Ho (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nha Trang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBi Knh
Death PlaceNha Trang, Diocese of Nha Trang

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2009
  • d: CB, 14 Feb 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 2 Apr 2020

Quantcast