Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul L Dac Trong

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of H Ni

Titular Bishop of Igilgili


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1918BornKim Lam
1 Apr 194829.8Ordained PriestPriest of H Ni, Viet Nam
23 Mar 199475.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of H Ni, Viet Nam
23 Mar 199475.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Igilgili
15 Aug 199476.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Igilgili
21 Jan 200687.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of H Ni, Viet Nam
7 Sep 200991.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of H Ni, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul L Dac Trong:
Bishop Paul L Dac Trong (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of H Ni

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2006
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,358
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013