Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Chu Văn Minh

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hà Nội, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1943 Born
10 Jun 199450.4Ordained PriestPriest of Hà Nội, Viet Nam
15 Oct 200864.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hà Nội, Viet Nam
15 Oct 200864.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia
5 Dec 200864.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thinisa in Numidia
26 Jan 201975.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Hà Nội, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Laurent Chu Văn Minh
Bishop Laurent Chu Văn Minh (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Hà Nội

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNam Đinh
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Nam Đinh

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Hà Nội.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,992
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 26 Jan 2019

Quantcast