Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Bui Tuân

Bishop Emeritus of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1928 Born
2 Sep 195527.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 197546.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam
15 Apr 197546.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabunia
30 Apr 197546.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabunia
30 Dec 199769.5SucceededBishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam
2 Oct 200375.2RetiredBishop of Long Xuyên, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Bui Tuân
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Bui Tuân (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Long Xuyên

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCam Lai

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Long Xuyên.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast