Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Martin Ngô-D́nh-Thuc

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Huế, Viet Nam

Titular Archbishop of Bulla Regia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1897Born
20 Dec 192528.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 193840.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Vinh Long, Viet Nam
8 Jan 193840.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Saesina
4 May 193840.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saesina
24 Nov 196063.1AppointedArchbishop of Huế, Viet Nam
17 Feb 196870.3ResignedArchbishop of Huế, Viet Nam
17 Feb 196870.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bulla Regia
Dec 1975³78.1Excommunicated
20 Sep 197678.9Reconciled
12 Mar 198385.4Excommunicated
11 Jul 198486.7Reconciled
13 Dec 198487.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Huế, Viet Nam

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Pierre Martin Ngô-D́nh-Thuc (VIAF: 45452919)
Archbishop Pierre Martin Ngô-D́nh-Thuc (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Huế

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhu-Cam

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 46.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 34
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast