Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Trần Văn Thiện

Deceased

Bishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1908Born
21 Sep 193526.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Nov 196052.1AppointedBishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
22 Jan 196152.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
24 Feb 198980.3DiedBishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Trần Văn Thiện
Bishop Joseph Trần Văn Thiện (born , died ) Bishop of Mỹ Tho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLong-Dien

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast