Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Nguyễn Văn Nam

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1922Born
29 Mar 195230.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 197553.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
6 Jun 197553.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Puppi
10 Jun 197553.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Puppi
24 Feb 198967.0SucceededBishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
26 Mar 199977.0RetiredBishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
16 Mar 200684.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for André Nguyễn Văn Nam
Bishop André Nguyễn Văn Nam (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mỹ Tho

EventPlace
Birth PlaceThanh My An
Ordained BishopJohn XXIII Seminary, Mỹ Tho, Diocese of Mỹ Tho

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Vatican Information Service, 27 Apr 2006
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,643

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 May 2020

Quantcast