Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidore-Marie-Joseph Dumortier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Saigon, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Lipara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1869Born
27 May 189324.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
17 Dec 192556.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saigon, Viet Nam
17 Dec 192556.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lipara
25 Mar 192656.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lipara
16 Feb 194070.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Saigon, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Isidore-Marie-Joseph Dumortier
Bishop Isidore-Marie-Joseph Dumortier M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Saigon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHalluin, France

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast