Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Maximilien Chabalier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh

Titular Bishop of Pharan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1887BornCheylard-l'Evêque, France
28 Jun 191325.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
2 Dec 193750.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
2 Dec 193750.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pharan
24 Feb 193850.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pharan
11 Jun 195567.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Maximilien Chabalier:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Maximilien Chabalier M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013