Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh

Apostolicus Vicariatus de Phnom-Penh



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 3 December 1924
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Cambodia
  • Square Kilometers: 31,946 (12,339 Square Miles)
  • Description: Phnom Penh city, Kep city, Sihanoukville, the provinces of Kandal, Takeo, Kampot, Kompong Speu and Koh Kong.
  • Mailing Address: 787 Monivong Bld, B.P. 123, Phnom-Penh, Cambodge
  • Telephone: (023)21.24.62
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Cambogia
30 August 1850ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Cambogia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Cambogia Vicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh
26 September 1968Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh Prefecture Apostolic of Battambang (erected)
26 September 1968Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh Prefecture Apostolic of Kompong-Cham (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh
1950109,2244,500,0002.4%80261061,0303950449ap1951
197032,9202,635,0001.2%3329625305126832ap1971
19735,3353,000,000.2%15112620514479ap1991
199912,7004,326,000.3%6131966817513ap2000
200013,0004,330,000.3%64101,3008513ap2001
200113,5004,326,000.3%10102067514483ap2002
200213,2504,400,000.3%2151777919514ap2003
20038,4804,500,000.2%2182042423424ap2004
200415,3824,550,000.3%2222464033454ap2005
201013,2835,287,000.3%32407218470756ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 21 Apr 2013