Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Laurent-François-Xavier Cordier, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cambogia, Cambodia

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1821Born
20 Jun 184726.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1874²52.6AppointedSuperior of Cambogia, Cambodia
18 Jul 188261.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cambogia, Cambodia
18 Jul 188261.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
1 Sep 188261.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
14 Aug 189574.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Cambogia, Cambodia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marie-Laurent-François-Xavier Cordier
Bishop Marie-Laurent-François-Xavier Cordier M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cambogia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillar-sur-Pancrace, France

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 291
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017