Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Labartette, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Vera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1746Born
28 Feb 177225.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
30 Mar 178437.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
30 Mar 178437.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vera
21 Sep 179347.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vera
9 Oct 179953.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
6 Aug 182377.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean Labartette
Bishop Jean Labartette M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAinhoa, France

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,793, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 438, and Page 455
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast