Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-André Doussain, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

Titular Bishop of Adraa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1756BornDoué-la-Fontaine, France
23 Jul 179842.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
23 Jul 179842.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Adraa
2 Oct 180852.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adraa
14 Dec 180953.7DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean-André Doussain:
Bishop Jean-André Doussain M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013