Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Grosgeorge, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cambogia, Cambodia

Titular Bishop of Oëa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1846Born
28 Oct 186923.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
28 Jan 189649.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cambogia, Cambodia
28 Jan 189649.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Oëa
24 May 189649.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oëa
1 Mar 190255.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Cambogia, Cambodia

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Grosgeorge (VIAF: 14759660)
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Grosgeorge M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cambogia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Voivre, France
Ordained BishopDau Nuoc

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 422
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017