Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Antoine-Louis Caspar, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Canatha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1841Born
Sep 1861³20.1ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
17 Dec 186423.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Mar 188038.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam
23 Mar 188038.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
24 Aug 188039.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
18 Jul 190765.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam
13 Jun 191775.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marie-Antoine-Louis Caspar
Bishop Marie-Antoine-Louis Caspar M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Northern Cochin {Cocincina Settentrionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceObernai, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saigon

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 178
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017