Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yves-Marie Georges René Ramousse, M.E.P.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

Titular Bishop of Pisita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1928 Born
4 Apr 195325.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
12 Nov 196234.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
12 Nov 196234.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pisita
24 Feb 196335.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pisita
30 Apr 197648.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
6 Jul 199264.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
21 Dec 199264.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Battambang, Cambodia
2 Jul 200072.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Battambang, Cambodia
14 Apr 200173.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

MicroData Summary for Yves-Marie Georges René Ramousse (VIAF: 201103430)
Bishop Yves-Marie Georges René Ramousse M.E.P. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Phnom-Penh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSembadel, France

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • fn/batt: CB, 5 Nov 2017
  • batt: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Jul 2018

Quantcast