Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Claude Cardinal Hollerich, S.J.

Archbishop of Luxembourg

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Crisostomo a Monte Sacro Alto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1958 Born
27 Sep 198123.1EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
21 Apr 199031.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
18 Oct 200244.1Final VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Jul 201152.9AppointedArchbishop of Luxembourg
16 Oct 201153.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Luxembourg
5 Oct 201961.1Elevated to Cardinal
5 Oct 201961.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Crisostomo a Monte Sacro Alto

MicroData Summary for Jean-Claude Hollerich (VIAF: 104145541817196600769)
Jean-Claude Cardinal Hollerich S.J. (born ) Archbishop of Luxembourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDifferdange, Archdiocese of Luxembourg
Ordained PriestBrussels
Ordained BishopCathedral, Luxembourg, Archdiocese of Luxembourg

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Luxembourg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2011
  • ob/c23: CB, 21 Sep 2011
  • c34: CB, 11 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,177
  • card: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2019
  • cpri: Bollettino, 5 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 5 Oct 2019

Quantcast