Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Hengen

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Luxembourg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1912BornDudelange
27 Oct 194027.9Ordained PriestPriest of Luxembourg
8 Apr 196754.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Luxembourg
8 Apr 196754.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
4 Jun 196754.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
13 Feb 197158.2SucceededBishop of Luxembourg
16 May 198572.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Luxembourg
23 Apr 198875.4AppointedArchbishop of Luxembourg
21 Dec 199078.0RetiredArchbishop of Luxembourg
29 Jan 200592.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Luxembourg

MicroData Summary for Jean Hengen:
Archbishop Jean Hengen (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Luxembourg

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015