Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Kleinermeilert

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Pausulae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1928 Born
10 Oct 195325.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
3 May 196840.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
3 May 196840.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Pausulae
11 Jun 196840.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pausulae
1 Apr 200375.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Alfred Kleinermeilert
Bishop Alfred Kleinermeilert (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuesch

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trier.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018